AR HB1280 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Use Of Tanning Equipment By Minors; And To Amend The Definition Of "tanning Equipment".
Title
To Prohibit The Use Of Tanning Equipment By Minors; And To Amend The Definition Of "tanning Equipment".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 27 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-02-07 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |