AR HB1270 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Notification that HB1270 is now Act 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Notification that HB1270 is now Act 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding The State Plant Board Industrial Hemp Research Program; And To Allow The State Plant Board To Establish And Collect Fees To Administer The Industrial Hemp Research Program.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding The State Plant Board Industrial Hemp Research Program; And To Allow The State Plant Board To Establish And Collect Fees To Administer The Industrial Hemp Research Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Notification that HB1270 is now Act 140 |
2019-02-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |