AR HB1269 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Concealed Handgun Licensee To Keep A Handgun In His Or Her Locked Vehicle On His Or Her Employer's Parking Lot.
Title
To Allow A Concealed Handgun Licensee To Keep A Handgun In His Or Her Locked Vehicle On His Or Her Employer's Parking Lot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1269 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1269.pdf |