AR HB1264 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1264 is now Act 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1264 is now Act 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Small Town Economic Development Act.
Title
To Create The Small Town Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1264 is now Act 568 |
2021-04-01 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |