AR HB1261 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that HB1261 is now Act 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that HB1261 is now Act 285
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The State Water Pollution Control Agency; To Authorize The Agency To Administer The Section 404 Permitting Program Of The Federal Clean Water Act In Lieu Of The United States Army Corps Of Engineers.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The State Water Pollution Control Agency; To Authorize The Agency To Administer The Section 404 Permitting Program Of The Federal Clean Water Act In Lieu Of The United States Army Corps Of Engineers.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Notification that HB1261 is now Act 285 |
2021-03-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |