AR HB1259 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1259 is now Act 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1259 is now Act 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Publication And Distribution Of Rules And Regulations By The Board Of Corrections.
Title
Concerning The Publication And Distribution Of Rules And Regulations By The Board Of Corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Notification that HB1259 is now Act 396 |
2019-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |