AR HB1258 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1258 is now Act 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1258 is now Act 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Re-establish The Legislative Task Force On Intermodal Transportation And Commerce.
Title
To Re-establish The Legislative Task Force On Intermodal Transportation And Commerce.
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pitsch [R] | Sen. Jake Files [R] | Rep. Scott Baltz [D] | Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Rep. Mary Hickerson [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Sen. James Sturch [R] | Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Notification that HB1258 is now Act 166 |
2015-02-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed |