AR HB1256 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Redetermination Of Benefits Under The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Redetermination Of Benefits Under The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-31HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-31HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-31HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback