AR HB1252 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Cities To Remove Vehicles From Private Property In Certain Situations.
Title
To Allow Cities To Remove Vehicles From Private Property In Certain Situations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Baker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Read third time and failed to pass. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-28 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-02-28 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-24 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-24 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-24 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-23 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-01-27 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-01-27 | House Filed |