AR HB1245 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Notification that HB1245 is now Act 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Notification that HB1245 is now Act 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Include A Podiatrist Within The Definition Of "physician" For Purposes Of The Sales Tax Exemption For Durable Medical Equipment, Mobility Enhancing Equipment, Prosthetic Devices, And Disposable Medical Supplies.
Title
To Include A Podiatrist Within The Definition Of "physician" For Purposes Of The Sales Tax Exemption For Durable Medical Equipment, Mobility Enhancing Equipment, Prosthetic Devices, And Disposable Medical Supplies.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Notification that HB1245 is now Act 172 |
2019-02-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-14 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |