AR HB1244 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
Pending: Senate State Agencies & Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Supervisory Powers Of The Department Of Community Correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Supervisory Powers Of The Department Of Community Correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-01-31SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-29HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback