AR HB1244 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1244 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1244 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Real Estate License Law, The Definition Of "principal Broker", And Certain Real Estate License Exemptions.
Title
To Clarify The Real Estate License Law, The Definition Of "principal Broker", And Certain Real Estate License Exemptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Rushing [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] | Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Notification that HB1244 is now Act 278 |
2015-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |