AR HB1242 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Notification that HB1242 is now Act 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Notification that HB1242 is now Act 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Administrative Directives That Address Transitional Housing Facilities Approved By The Board Of Corrections And Licensed By The Department Of Community Correction.
Title
Concerning Administrative Directives That Address Transitional Housing Facilities Approved By The Board Of Corrections And Licensed By The Department Of Community Correction.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Notification that HB1242 is now Act 159 |
2019-02-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-01-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |