AR HB1231 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1231 is now Act 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Ensure The Freedom Of Expression Of A Student Journalist At A Public Institution Of Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Ensure The Freedom Of Expression Of A Student Journalist At A Public Institution Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseNotification that HB1231 is now Act 395
2019-03-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-06HouseSenate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
2019-03-06HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
2019-03-04HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2019-03-04SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-02-25SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-06HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback