AR HB1231 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning School Security And School Crisis Response Training; To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning School Security And School Crisis Response Training; To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-01HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2013-02-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-20HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-02-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-02-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-12HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-12HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-02-12HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback