AR HB1228 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - Notification that HB1228 is now Act 874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Establishment Of A Designated Entertainment District In An Area With Entities Authorized To Sell Alcoholic Beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Establishment Of A Designated Entertainment District In An Area With Entities Authorized To Sell Alcoholic Beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25HouseNotification that HB1228 is now Act 874
2021-04-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-20HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-20SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-17SenateEXPUNGED
2021-03-17SenateRead the third time and failed.
2021-03-16SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-02-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-04SenateReceived from the House.
2021-02-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback