AR HB1227 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1227 is now Act 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1227 is now Act 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Local Law Enforcement Agency To Charge A Reasonable Fee For Noncriminal Fingerprinting Services.
Title
To Allow A Local Law Enforcement Agency To Charge A Reasonable Fee For Noncriminal Fingerprinting Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Notification that HB1227 is now Act 163 |
2015-02-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed |