AR HB1219 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1219 is now Act 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1219 is now Act 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Forfeiture Of Retirement Benefits By A Judge Or Justice Who Is Seventy (70) Years Of Age.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Forfeiture Of Retirement Benefits By A Judge Or Justice Who Is Seventy (70) Years Of Age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1219 is now Act 753 |
2019-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The vote by which HB1219 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |