AR HB1215 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1215 is now Act 1333
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1215 is now Act 1333
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Regarding The Use Of The Money In The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund; And To Eliminate The Grant Program Under The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund Act.
Title
To Amend The Laws Regarding The Use Of The Money In The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund; And To Eliminate The Grant Program Under The Solid Waste Management And Recycling Fund Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1215 is now Act 1333 |
2013-04-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |