AR HB1204 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Private Schools To Administer An Annual Statewide Student Assessment; And To Require Private Schools To Admit Each Student Who Applies For Admission And Intends To Cover Private School Costs With State Funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Private Schools To Administer An Annual Statewide Student Assessment; And To Require Private Schools To Admit Each Student Who Applies For Admission And Intends To Cover Private School Costs With State Funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-13HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-01-24HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback