AR HB1202 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Notification that HB1202 is now Act 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Notification that HB1202 is now Act 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Comprehensive Criminal Record Sealing Act Of 2013 To Allow A State Agency Or Board Engaged In The Licensing Of Medical Professionals To Have Access To And Use Of Expunged And Sealed Records Of Criminal Convictions.
Title
To Amend The Comprehensive Criminal Record Sealing Act Of 2013 To Allow A State Agency Or Board Engaged In The Licensing Of Medical Professionals To Have Access To And Use Of Expunged And Sealed Records Of Criminal Convictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Notification that HB1202 is now Act 139 |
2017-02-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |