AR HB1202 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Mandatory Loss Of Retirement Benefits For Members Of The Arkansas Judicial Retirement System.
Title
Concerning The Mandatory Loss Of Retirement Benefits For Members Of The Arkansas Judicial Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1202 failed of adoption (Y: 33 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-18 | House | Motion to reconsider HB1202 failed of adoption |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |