AR HB1200 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that HB1200 is now Act 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that HB1200 is now Act 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Rehabilitation Services Forgiveness Of Student Loan Program; And To Clarify Requirements For Eligibility.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Rehabilitation Services Forgiveness Of Student Loan Program; And To Clarify Requirements For Eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Notification that HB1200 is now Act 282 |
2021-03-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed |