AR HB1199 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1199 is now Act 1446
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1199 is now Act 1446
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Teacher Retirement System Employer Contributions.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Teacher Retirement System Employer Contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1199 is now Act 1446 |
2013-04-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Held in Chamber |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed |