AR HB1191 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Notification that HB1191 is now Act 172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Management And Sale Of Tax Delinquent Lands By The Commissioner Of State Lands; And To Standardize The Use Of The Term "parcel".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Management And Sale Of Tax Delinquent Lands By The Commissioner Of State Lands; And To Standardize The Use Of The Term "parcel".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02HouseNotification that HB1191 is now Act 172
2023-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-02-27SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-02-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-02-07SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-06HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2023-01-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-01-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1191&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1191.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1191%2FHB1191012620230902.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1191%2FHB1191020620230900.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=172.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1191-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1191-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1191&rcs=146&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1191&rcs=318&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback