AR HB1188 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1188 is now Act 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1188 is now Act 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Exemptions To The Private Security Agency, Private Investigator, And School Security Licensing And Credentialing Act.
Title
Concerning Exemptions To The Private Security Agency, Private Investigator, And School Security Licensing And Credentialing Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1188 is now Act 660 |
2021-04-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-07 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed |