AR HB1187 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Notification that HB1187 is now Act 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The University Of Arkansas Community College At Rich Mountain Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The University Of Arkansas Community College At Rich Mountain Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseNotification that HB1187 is now Act 303
2019-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-02-27SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-02-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-26SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-02-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-02-26HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback