AR HB1186 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Notification that HB1186 is now Act 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Notification that HB1186 is now Act 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend And Update The Law Concerning Annuity Options Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend And Update The Law Concerning Annuity Options Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1186 is now Act 170 |
2023-02-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-21 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |