AR HB1182 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Notification that HB1182 is now Act 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Clarity Regarding The Certification Of A Veterinary Technician Specialist; And To Authorize A Collaborative Practice Agreement Between A Veterinarian And A Veterinary Technician Specialist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Clarity Regarding The Certification Of A Veterinary Technician Specialist; And To Authorize A Collaborative Practice Agreement Between A Veterinarian And A Veterinary Technician Specialist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseNotification that HB1182 is now Act 161
2023-02-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-23HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-02-22HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2023-02-16HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2023-02-16HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-02-16SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2023-02-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-15SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-15SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2023-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2023-02-06SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-02HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-01HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2023-01-31HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-31HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-31HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2023-01-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1182&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182%2FHB1182013120230938.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182%2FHB1182020220230946.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182%2FHB1182021520231341.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=161.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182-H2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1182-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1182&rcs=131&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1182&rcs=226&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1182&rcs=331&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback