AR HB1180 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1180 is now Act 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives - Staff Appropriation For The 2023-2024 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas House Of Representatives - Staff Appropriation For The 2023-2024 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06HouseNotification that HB1180 is now Act 213
2023-03-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-02-28SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-02-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-01-26SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2023-01-26SenateReceived from the House.
2023-01-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-01-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-01-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-01-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2023-01-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback