AR HB1173 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1173 is now Act 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Repeal The Prohibition On Licensing New Psychological Examiners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Repeal The Prohibition On Licensing New Psychological Examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11HouseNotification that HB1173 is now Act 573
2023-04-06HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-06HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-06SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2023-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-04-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2023-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-03HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2023-02-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-02HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-25HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-01-25HouseMotion to rerefer back to committe passed
2023-01-24HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-01-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-01-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1173&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1173.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1173%2FHB1173020220230934.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1173%2FHB1173040320231438.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=573.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1173-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1173-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1173&rcs=854&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1173&rcs=1012&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback