AR HB1170 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1170 is now Act 1444
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1170 is now Act 1444
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Arkansas Local Police And Fire Retirement System And Declaring An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Arkansas Local Police And Fire Retirement System And Declaring An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1170 is now Act 1444 |
2013-04-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-16 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |