AR HB1164 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that HB1164 is now Act 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that HB1164 is now Act 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Correction Of Errors Arising From The Erroneous Sale Of Lands Of The State Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties Of The Commissioner Of State Lands.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Correction Of Errors Arising From The Erroneous Sale Of Lands Of The State Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties Of The Commissioner Of State Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Notification that HB1164 is now Act 53 |
2023-02-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-01-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |