AR HB1160 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 82-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Increase The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For A Used Motor Vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Increase The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For A Used Motor Vehicle.

Sponsors

Rep. John Payton [R]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]Rep. Rick Beck [R]
Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]
Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. Joshua Bryant [R]Rep. John Carr [R]
Rep. Craig Christiansen [R]Rep. Joe Cloud [R]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]Rep. Cameron Cooper [R]
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]
Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Brian Evans [R]
Rep. Charlene Fite [R]Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Tony Furman [R]Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]
Rep. Justin Gonzales [R]Rep. Michelle Gray [R]Rep. Delia Haak [R]Rep. Spencer Hawks [R]
Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Mike Holcomb [R]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Rep. Lane Jean [R]
Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Lee Johnson [R]Rep. Jack Ladyman [R]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]
Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]Rep. Julie Mayberry [R]
Rep. Rick McClure [R]Rep. Mark McElroy [R]Rep. Richard McGrew [R]Rep. Gayla McKenzie [R]
Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]
Rep. Clint Penzo [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]Rep. David Ray [R]Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]
Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Keith Slape [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Stu Smith [R]
Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]
Rep. Richard Womack [R]Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Rep. Jack Fortner [R]Sen. Bob Ballinger [R]
Sen. Charles Beckham [R]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]Sen. Alan Clark [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]
Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]

Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2021-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-03HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-28HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1160&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1160/HB1160011220211132.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1160/HB1160012620211043.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1160/HB1160012820210937.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1160/HB1160020320210937.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1160-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1160-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1160-H3.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1160-DFA1.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1160-DFA2.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1160-DFA3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1160&rcs=2687&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1160&rcs=2787&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback