AR HB1160 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Prescriptive Authority Of An Advanced Practice Registered Nurse; And To Create An Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Subcommittee In The Arkansas State Board Of Nursing.
Title
To Amend The Prescriptive Authority Of An Advanced Practice Registered Nurse; And To Create An Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Subcommittee In The Arkansas State Board Of Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - Clincher motion failed of adoption. (Y: 48 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-25 | House | Clincher motion failed of adoption. |
2015-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |