AR HB1157 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Notification that HB1157 is now Act 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Notification that HB1157 is now Act 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Public School Districts And Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools To Provide Information To Public School Students Regarding Water Safety Education Courses And Swimming Lessons.
Title
To Require Public School Districts And Open-enrollment Public Charter Schools To Provide Information To Public School Students Regarding Water Safety Education Courses And Swimming Lessons.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] | Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] |
Rep. Cindy Crawford [R] | Rep. Matt Duffield [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Rep. Charlene Fite [R] |
Rep. Zack Gramlich [R] | Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Rep. RJ Hawk [R] | Rep. DeAnna Hodges [R] |
Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] | Rep. Wayne Long [R] | Rep. Mindy McAlindon [R] | Rep. Stetson Painter [R] |
Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R] | Rep. Ryan Rose [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. Bart Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Notification that HB1157 is now Act 101 |
2023-02-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed |