AR HB1156 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Enhance The 911 System In Arkansas; To Modify The Distribution Of Moneys In The Arkansas High Cost Fund; And To Modify The Distribution Of Moneys In The Arkansas 911 Rural Enhancement Program Fund.
Title
To Enhance The 911 System In Arkansas; To Modify The Distribution Of Moneys In The Arkansas High Cost Fund; And To Modify The Distribution Of Moneys In The Arkansas 911 Rural Enhancement Program Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |