AR HB1152 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1152 is now Act 790
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1152 is now Act 790
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Create Gabo's Law; To Allow For Emergency Medical Care To Be Provided To Injured Police Dogs; And To Provide Immunity.
Title
To Create Gabo's Law; To Allow For Emergency Medical Care To Be Provided To Injured Police Dogs; And To Provide Immunity.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] | Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D] | Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] |
Rep. Jack Fortner [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Notification that HB1152 is now Act 790 |
2021-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-12 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |