AR HB1152 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Southern Arkansas University - Arkansas School Of Veterinary Medicine Feasibility Study Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Southern Arkansas University - Arkansas School Of Veterinary Medicine Feasibility Study Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-29 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 House Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2012-02-29 House Read the third time and failed.
2012-02-27 House Read the third time and failed.
2012-02-23 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2012-02-23 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2012-02-23 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2012-02-22 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2012-02-13 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2012-02-10 House Prefiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback