AR HB1148 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Notification that HB1148 is now Act 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Notification that HB1148 is now Act 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Defenses To Prosecution For A Violation Of Operating An All-terrain Vehicle Upon A Public Street Or Highway.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Defenses To Prosecution For A Violation Of Operating An All-terrain Vehicle Upon A Public Street Or Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Notification that HB1148 is now Act 272 |
2017-02-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-03 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed |