AR HB1145 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - House Notification that HB1145 is now Act 258

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Reappropriation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-26 House Notification that HB1145 is now Act 258
2010-02-25 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2010-02-25 House TO BE ENROLLED
2010-02-25 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Returned to the House as Passed.
2010-02-25 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2010-02-25 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Rules suspended.
2010-02-25 Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2010-02-24 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2010-02-24 Senate Received from the House.
2010-02-24 House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2010-02-24 House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2010-02-24 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2010-02-23 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2010-02-23 House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2010-02-23 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2010-02-23 House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2010-02-23 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2010-02-23 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2010-02-22 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2010-02-22 House Re-referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
2010-02-18 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2010-02-08 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2010-02-05 House Prefiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback