AR HB1142 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Notification that HB1142 is now Act 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Payment Of A Security Presumed To Be Abandoned Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Payment Of A Security Presumed To Be Abandoned Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseNotification that HB1142 is now Act 421
2017-03-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-02HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-01HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-02-28HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-02-28HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-02-28SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-27SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-27SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-23SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2017-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-23HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-01-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2017-01-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback