AR HB1141 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Notification that HB1141 is now Act 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09HouseNotification that HB1141 is now Act 270
2016-05-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-05SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2016-05-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-05SenateThe vote by which the Emergency Clause failed of adoption was expunged
2016-05-05SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2016-05-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-04SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-05-04SenateReceived from the House.
2016-05-04HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2016-05-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2016-05-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2016-05-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2016-04-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-04-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback