AR HB1131 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide For Restitution For A Homicide Victim's Surviving Dependent Child When The Defendant Was Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated At The Time Of The Homicide; And To Establish Bentley's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide For Restitution For A Homicide Victim's Surviving Dependent Child When The Defendant Was Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated At The Time Of The Homicide; And To Establish Bentley's Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-01-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-25HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-24HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-01-24HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-01-24HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1131&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1131.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1131%2FHB1131012420230937.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1131%2FHB1131012520230937.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1131-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1131-H2.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1131-DFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1131-DFA2.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback