AR HB1127 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that HB1127 is now Act 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that HB1127 is now Act 192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make An Appropriation For State Turnback For Counties And Muncipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2022; And For Other Purposes.
Title
An Act To Make An Appropriation For State Turnback For Counties And Muncipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2022; And For Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1127 is now Act 192 |
2021-02-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed |