AR HB1126 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 94-34)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Notification that HB1126 is now Act 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Veterans' Affairs - Cemetery Expansion Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Veterans' Affairs - Cemetery Expansion Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors

Rep. Douglas House [R]Sen. Alan Clark [R]Rep. Andy Mayberry [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]
Sen. Bryan King [R]Sen. Bill Sample [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Bob Ballinger [R]
Rep. Scott Baltz [D]Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R]Rep. Rick Beck [R]Rep. Mary Bentley [R]
Rep. Charles Blake [D]Sen. William Bond [D]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]
Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. LeAnne Burch [D]Rep. Charlotte Douglas [R]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]
Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Rep. Sarah Capp [R]Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]
Rep. Charles Collins [R]Sen. Linda Collins-Smith [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Dan Douglas [R]
Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D]Rep. David Meeks [R]Sen. David Sanders [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]
Rep. David Whitaker [D]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Andy Davis [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]
Rep. Jana Della Rosa [R]Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Trevor Drown [R]Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D]
Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D]Rep. Les Eaves [R]Sen. Joyce Elliott [D]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]
Rep. Fred Allen [D]Rep. Joe Farrer [R]Rep. David Fielding [D]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]
Rep. Jack Fortner [R]Rep. Grant Hodges [R]Rep. George McGill [D]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Rep. Mickey Gates [R]Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Justin Gonzales [R]Rep. Kim Hammer [R]
Rep. Kenneth Henderson [R]Sen. Bart Hester [R]Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]
Rep. Mike Holcomb [D]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. John Cooper [R]
Sen. Jane English [R]Sen. Jim Hendren [R]Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R]Rep. Jeff Williams [R]
Rep. Lane Jean [R]Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. J.P. Johnson [D]Rep. Ken Ferguson [D]
Rep. Kim Hendren [R]Sen. Keith Ingram [D]Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D]Sen. Lance Eads [R]
Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Jack Ladyman [R]Rep. Greg Leding [D]Rep. Tim Lemons [R]
Rep. Frederick Love [D]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]
Rep. Michelle Gray [R]Rep. Monte Hodges [D]Rep. Michael Gray [D]Rep. John Maddox [R]
Rep. Stephen Magie [D]Sen. Bruce Maloch [D]Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]Rep. Mark McElroy [D]
Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. Reginald Murdock [D]Rep. Milton Nicks [D]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Clint Penzo [R]Rep. Rebecca Petty [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]
Rep. Matthew Pitsch [R]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Rep. Chris Richey [D]
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Laurie Rushing [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Sen. Stephanie Flowers [D]
Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]Rep. Warwick Sabin [D]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]Rep. Jim Sorvillo [R]
Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. James Sturch [R]Rep. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. Trent Garner [R]
Sen. Larry Teague [D]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Rep. Clarke Tucker [D]Sen. Uvalde Lindsey [D]
Rep. Vivian Flowers [D]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. John Walker [D]Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]
Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Rep. Richard Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseNotification that HB1126 is now Act 226
2018-03-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2018-03-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2018-03-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2018-03-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2018-03-01SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2018-03-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2018-02-28SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2018-02-28SenateReceived from the House.
2018-02-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2018-02-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2018-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2018-02-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2018-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2018-02-22HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2018-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2018-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback