AR HB1122 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - House Notification that HB1122 is now Act 254
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - House Notification that HB1122 is now Act 254
Summary
An Act For The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences - Reynolds Center On Aging, Boozman College Of Public Health, Arkansas Biosciences Institute And The Area Health Education Center In Helena Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences - Reynolds Center On Aging, Boozman College Of Public Health, Arkansas Biosciences Institute And The Area Health Education Center In Helena Appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | House Notification that HB1122 is now Act 254 | |
2010-02-25 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2010-02-25 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2010-02-25 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Returned to the House as Passed. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2010-02-24 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2010-02-24 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2010-02-24 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2010-02-24 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2010-02-23 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 | |
2010-02-23 | House Re-referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House The vote by which HB1122 Passed was expunged. | |
2010-02-22 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-22 | House Read the third time and passed. | |
2010-02-22 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2010-02-18 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2010-02-17 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2010-02-17 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2010-02-17 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2010-02-08 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2010-02-04 | House Prefiled |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2009/2010F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1122 |