AR HB1121 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1121 is now Act 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Coverage For Biomarker Testing For Early Detection And Management For Cancer Diagnoses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Coverage For Biomarker Testing For Early Detection And Management For Cancer Diagnoses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseNotification that HB1121 is now Act 429
2023-03-30HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-29HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-29SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2023-03-13SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-28HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2023-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1121&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1121.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1121%2FHB1121021520230959.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1121%2FHB1121022820231043.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=429.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1121-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1121-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1121&rcs=480&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1121&rcs=667&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback