AR HB1118 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Notification that HB1118 is now Act 306
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Notification that HB1118 is now Act 306
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide That Sales By A Cottage Food Production Operation Through The Internet Are Exempt From The Definition Of "food Service Establishment"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide That Sales By A Cottage Food Production Operation Through The Internet Are Exempt From The Definition Of "food Service Establishment"; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Notification that HB1118 is now Act 306 |
2021-03-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-03-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-02-25 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed |