AR HB1116 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1116 is now Act 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Notification that HB1116 is now Act 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise The Hours Of Employment Allowed For Children Under Seventeen (17) Years Of Age And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Revise The Hours Of Employment Allowed For Children Under Seventeen (17) Years Of Age And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Les Eaves [R] | Rep. Mary Hickerson [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Petty [R] | Rep. Marcus Richmond [R] | Rep. Laurie Rushing [R] | Rep. Deann Vaught [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Notification that HB1116 is now Act 162 |
2015-02-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-01-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-01-21 | House | Filed |